IL HB1444 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the Board shall determine the amortization period to be used in calculating the amount to be contributed by participating municipalities and participating instrumentalities in order to adjust for changes in the Fund's unfunded accrued liabilities. Specifies that the amortization period shall not exceed 30 years for participating municipalities or 10 years for participating instrumentalities. Allows participating employees to withdraw additional contributions only to the extent permitted by the federal Internal Revenue Code of 1986. Requires the Board to meet at least quarterly (rather than monthly). Also makes technical changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-IMRF-AMORTIZATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0218 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 12, 2013 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 7-135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-146 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-173 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-177 | Amended Code | Citation Text |