IL HB1443 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0614
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0614
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community Health Center Expansion Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the reporting requirement for grant recipients.
Title
HEALTH-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 93 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0614 |
2018-07-20 | House | Effective Date July 20, 2018 |
2018-07-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 093-016-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-009-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 016-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-19 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-16 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-16 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 66 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |