IL HB1404 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Construction Bond Act. Requires surety bonds on public construction projects by any political subdivision of the State costing over $50,000 (now, over $5,000). Makes surety bond requirements for any political subdivision of the State the same as those for the State. Effective immediately.
Title
PUBLIC CONSTRUCTION BONDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0216 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-002-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 010-000-000 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-011-000 |
2013-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-002-001 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 550 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |