IL HB1395 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, upon application of the owner of the certificate of purchase, the court shall declare a tax sale to be a sale in error if the improvements upon the property sold have been substantially destroyed or rendered uninhabitable or otherwise unfit for occupancy prior to the issuance of the tax deed (instead of subsequent to the tax sale and prior to the issuance of the tax deed). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SALES IN ERROR
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1395&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1395.htm |