IL HB1380 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Vetoed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Provides that, unless mutually agreed otherwise, any party to a collective bargaining agreement who fails to timely comply with an arbitration award or who, after timely demand, fails to submit a grievance dispute concerning the administration or interpretation of an agreement to arbitration shall pay to the prevailing party all reasonable costs of the proceeding in the trial and reviewing courts, including reasonable attorneys' fees. Provides that a charging party or person who, pursuant to an application for judicial review of an order of the Board issued in relation to an unfair labor practice proceeding, obtains a stay of the Board's order pending judicial review shall pay all reasonable costs of the proceedings in the reviewing courts, including reasonable attorneys' fees, as determined by the court, in the event the final unappealable decision of the reviewing courts is adverse to the party obtaining the stay. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PUBLIC LABOR-ATTORNEY FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 82 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-17 | House | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto |
2016-11-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2016-08-19 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 082-033-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-008-001 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 009-001-003 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 010-004-001 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-030-000 |
2016-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-04-22 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-010-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-02-23 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2015-03-26 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2015-03-24 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-03-24 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-03-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-007-000 |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 315 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |