IL HB1372 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Sanitary Food Preparation Act. Requires that all premises of a permitted food establishment, including indoor play areas, be kept clean, fully operative, and in good repair. Sets forth specific requirements for an owner or operator of a permitted food establishment with an indoor play area. Sets forth mandatory procedures for when vomiting or fecal accidents occur in or around an indoor play area. Sets forth provisions concerning signage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOOD PREP-INDOOR PLAY AREAS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-24HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2015-04-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2015-04-22HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2015-03-19HouseFiscal Note Filed
2015-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
2015-03-12HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2015-03-12HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2015-03-12HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2015-03-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2015-03-10HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 009-007-000
2015-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2015-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2015-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2015-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2015-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2015-02-24HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2015-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2015-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2015-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2015-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2015-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2015-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-04HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41065013.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback