IL HB1361 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that each taxpayer who serves as a firefighter during the taxable year is entitled to a credit of $1,000 against his or her income tax liability if the taxpayer completes a firefighter basic training course approved by the Office of the State Fire Marshal during the taxable year. Provides that the credit may be carried forward. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision.
Title
INC TX-CREDIT-FIRE TRAINING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1361&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1361.htm |