IL HB1359 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the School Board Member Recall Act. Establishes procedures under which school board members that were elected during a consolidated election may be recalled. Provides for petition requirements for recall elections. Provides for requirements for recall ballots, including requirements for replacement candidates wishing to be listed on the recall ballot.
Title
SCHOOL BOARD MEMBER RECALL
Sponsors
Rep. Martin McLaughlin [R] | Rep. David Friess [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] |
Rep. Jed Davis [R] | Rep. Dennis Tipsword [R] | Rep. Bradley Stephens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
2023-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis |
2023-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2023-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2023-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2023-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1359&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1359.htm |