IL HB1335 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning notices of cancellation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2017-04-18HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Laura Fine
2017-04-06HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155143.15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback