IL HB1316 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning unfair labor practice procedures.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-05-29 | House | Verified |
2017-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-050-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-26 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 011-007-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2017-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-15 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-05-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-05-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-05-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |