IL HB1292 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0455
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0455
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois; adds a chiropractic physician as a member of the State Board of Health. Amends the Hospice Program Licensing Act. Adds the following as a member of the Hospice and Palliative Care Advisory Board: a chiropractic physician, selected from the recommendations of the statewide chiropractic society representing the largest number of chiropractic physicians in the State. Provides that the chiropractic physician member shall serve for a term of 4 years. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE BD HEALTH-CHIROPRACTIC
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Mitchell [R] | Rep. Dan Reitz [D] | Rep. Angelo Saviano [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Rep. Michael Tryon [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0455 | |
2009-08-14 | Effective Date August 14, 2009 | |
2009-08-14 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-19 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-010-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-30 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-002-000 | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-03-06 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-03-06 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-03-06 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano |