IL HB1289 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that cognitive assessment and care planning services provided to a person who experiences signs or symptoms of cognitive impairment shall be covered under the medical assistance program for persons who are otherwise eligible for medical assistance. Defines "cognitive impairment" to mean a deficiency in: (i) short-term or long-term memory; (ii) orientation as to person, place, and time; or (iii) deductive or abstract reasoning. Provides that "cognitive impairment" does not include any condition with temporary or reversible effects.
Title
MEDICAID-COGNITIVE IMPAIRMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2023-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1289&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1289.htm |