IL HB1273 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Banking Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the primary powers of banks.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2018-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-04-27 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-03-01 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-02-28 | House | House Concurs |
2018-02-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 064-051-000 |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-02-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-02-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-02-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-02-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 030-023-000 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-12-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2017-04-28 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Re-assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |