IL HB1268 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Transitional Bilingual Education Article of the School Code. Provides that with regard to the implementation of the recommendations of the Advisory Council on Bilingual Education, a school district may require teachers of English Language Learner students, who are participating in English Language Learner courses not taught by English Language Learner-certified teachers, to participate in a one-day training session regarding the challenges for English Language Learner students. Provides that the training may be in place of any State Board of Education-related rule regarding required contact hours for such teachers. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-BIL ED-ENG LANG LEARNER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1268&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB1268.htm |