IL HB1237 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Strategic Action Plan for Aging Equity Act. Provides that the purpose of the Act is to appoint a planning commission to research and develop a comprehensive, cross-sector, long-term strategic action plan for aging equity that will lead to actionable goals and measurable outcomes for the years 2024 through 2036. Establishes the Strategic Action Planning Commission for Aging Equity. Provides that the planning commission shall be made up of State agency directors and appointed elected officials or their designees as ex officio members, and a group of voting individuals from the general public. Provides that the planning commission shall examine the effects, challenges, opportunities, and needs for planning related to the shifting age demographics toward an increasing portion of the State's and localities' populations being made up of older adults. Requires the planning commission to adopt guiding principles that include, but are not limited to: (i) advancing aging equity across the life course; (ii) developing cultural humility and being culturally responsive with inclusive policies, programs, and services; and (iii) harnessing the power of experience and knowledge of older persons in communities. Requires the Governor to appoint members to the planning commission within 3 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act; and to consult with the President and Minority Leader of the Senate, the Speaker and Minority Leader of the House of Representatives, and the Director of Aging about member appointments to ensure that (1) the planning commission reflects the geographic diversity of the State; (2) the planning commission is inclusive and consists of members who reflect a diversity of age, gender, ability, race, cultural, socioeconomic, and national background; (3) the planning commission includes Illinois residents age 60 or older; and other matters. Contains provisions on the composition of the planning commission; commission meetings; the commission's authority to establish a subcommittee; the establishment of an advisory committee; duties of the planning commission; data analysis; planning commission recommendations and reporting requirements; and other matters. Effective immediately.
Title
AGING EQUITY ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] |
Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |