IL HB1233 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospice Program Licensing Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the number of licensed hospice residences shall not exceed the following: (i) five hospice residences located in counties with a population of 700,000 or more; (ii) five hospice residences located in counties with a population of 200,000 or more but less than 700,000; and (iii) five hospice residences located in counties with a population of less than 200,000. Effective immediately.
Title
HOSPICE PROGRM-LIMIT IN COUNTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0207 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-001-000 |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-01 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 60 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |