IL HB1206 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that all property owned by the Executive Board of the Mutual Aid Box Alarm System that is used for the public purpose of disaster preparedness and response is exempt from the taxes imposed by the Code.
Title
PROP TX-MABAS PROP EXEMPT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0206 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-03-07 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |