IL HB1135 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that municipalities shall be liable for damages to real estate within or outside of the corporate boundaries of the municipality damaged by overflow or otherwise damaged by reason of the construction, enlargement or use of any channel, ditch, drain, outlet, or other improvement by the municipality. Provides that, if judgment is rendered against a municipality for damages, then the plaintiff may recover reasonable attorneys' fees. Specifies notice requirements. Amends the Local Governmental and Governmental Employees Tort Immunity Act. Provides that municipalities shall be liable for damages to real estate within or outside of the corporate boundaries of the municipality damaged under certain specified circumstances. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-LIABILITY-OVERFLOW
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-10 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 006-001-000 | |
2009-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Cities & Villages Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1135&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB1135.htm |