IL HB1127 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning piercing the body of a minor.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Statutes of Limitation |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-05-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-05-17 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-05-17 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-17 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2016-05-17 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015 |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-10.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12C-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |