IL HB1125 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Removes the Water Well and Pump Installation Contractor's License Act from the list of Acts to be repealed on January 1, 2012.
Title
WATER WELL & PUMP CONTRACTOR
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Karen May [D] | Rep. Michael Tryon [R] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] | Sen. Daniel Biss [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0024 |
2011-06-28 | House | Effective Date June 28, 2011 |
2011-06-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-12 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000 |
2011-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2011-04-01 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Karen May |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2011-04-01 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2011-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-02-23 | House | Remains in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2011-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2011-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen May |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 80 | 4.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |