IL HB1115 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. For redevelopment project areas designated after November 1, 1999, in municipalities with less than 1,000,000 population, modifies the formula for elementary, secondary, or unit school district's increased costs attributable to assisted housing units located within the redevelopment project area for which the developer or redeveloper receives financial assistance through an agreement with the municipality or because the municipality incurs the cost of necessary infrastructure improvements within the boundaries of the assisted housing sites necessary for the completion of that housing. Removes differences in formulation for alternate method districts, flat grant districts, and foundation districts. For school districts in a municipality with a population in excess of 1,000,000, changes the last date upon which a school district may submit a claim for reimbursement to the municipality to October 31 of each year (currently, September 30) and provides that municipalities shall reimburse school districts that have met specified criteria no later than January 31 of the school year in which the claim is made.
Title
TIF-REDEVELOPMENT PROJECT COST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-09 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1115&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1115.htm |