IL HB1115 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0811
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0811
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Insurance Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that Executive Order No. 2004-6 is superseded by the Act. Abolishes the Division of Insurance within the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation and creates the Department of Insurance. Transfers all the powers, duties, rights, and responsibilities of the Division of Insurance within the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to the Department of Insurance. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
INS CD - CREATE DEPT OF INS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-10-30 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-10-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-10-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-03 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0811 | |
2009-11-03 | Effective Date October 30, 2009 | |
2009-10-30 | Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses | |
2009-10-30 | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 053-000-000 | |
2009-10-30 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2009-10-22 | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-10-22 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 28, 2009 | |
2009-10-14 | Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 115-001-000 | |
2009-10-14 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2009-10-05 | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond | |
2009-10-05 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 14, 2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Governor Amendatory Veto | |
2009-06-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-14 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-14 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-24 | First Reading | |
2009-03-19 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-19 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-001-001 | |
2009-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 014-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-02-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady | |
2009-02-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |