IL HB1112 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0384
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0384
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department, subject to appropriation, to develop, publish, and disseminate a brochure to educate the general public about telemedicine.
Title
PUB HEALTH-TELEMEDICINE INFO
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-13 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0384 | |
2009-08-13 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-13 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 | |
2009-04-21 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 006-000-000 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jil Tracy |