IL HB1087 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0545
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0545
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Forestry Development Act. Changes "forestry management" to "forest management". Makes other name changes and revisions. Makes changes concerning cost share amounts and eligibility. Makes other changes. Creates the Forestry Development Council. Specifies the Council's membership and duties. Effective immediately.
Title
FORESTRY DEVELOPMENT
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Reitz [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-17 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0545 | |
2009-08-17 | Effective Date August 17, 2009 | |
2009-08-17 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-20 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-20 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-24 | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Reitz |