IL HB1011 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Boat Registration and Safety Act. Provides that water skiers, tubers, parasailers, or other persons towed by the motorboat shall be considered part of the total number of passengers and cargo allowed by a watercraft's capacity plate for the purpose of determining a motorboat's carrying capacity. Changes the definition of "authorized emergency watercraft" to include watercraft of specified agencies equipped with alternating flashing blue lights. Provides that a person who violates the Section concerning the falsification of registration stamps, licenses, or documentation is guilty of a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that a violation of specified Sections concerning boat rental services is a Class B misdemeanor. Provides that a person who is convicted or found guilty (instead of "convicted") of a violation of specified Sections of the Act shall have his or her privilege of operating a watercraft on State waterways suspended by the Department of Natural Resources for a period of not less than one year. To the list of offenses subject to the one-year suspension, adds violations of the Sections concerning resistance to officers, falsifying documents, and felony titling. Effective immediately.
Title
DNR: WATERCRAFT, OFFENSES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-22 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2013-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-003-000 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 45 | 11A-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 45 | 11A-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 45 | 11A-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 45 | 5-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 45 | 5-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |