IL HB1011 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Home Protection Pilot Program Act. Requires the Illinois Housing Development Authority to implement a pilot program to assist Illinois workers who have lost jobs as a result of changing economic conditions in Illinois when those workers are in need of assistance to avoid losing their homes to foreclosure. Provides that the Program shall include counties selected at the discretion of the Authority on the basis of increased rates of foreclosure, actual foreclosure filings, unemployment, the need of local counseling agencies for increased capacity to serve clients in need of assistance to avoid losing their homes to foreclosure, the availability of funding, and other factors the Authority determines to be relevant. Provides for loans to homeowners secured by liens on residential real property located in Illinois, and prohibits a mortgagee from engaging in certain conduct upon a mortgagor's filing of an application for loan assistance. Sets forth other provisions of the Program. Requires the Authority to conduct a study and to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by May 1, 2010.
Title
IHDA-HOME PROTECTION PILOT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaShawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1011&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB1011.htm |