IL HB1003 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0188
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0188
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that, except for property located in certain counties, if property that is the subject of an annexation agreement is located more than 1.5 miles from the corporate boundaries of the annexing municipality, that property is subject to the ordinances, control, and jurisdiction of the annexing municipality unless the county board retains jurisdiction by the affirmative vote of two-thirds of its members (now, the county board may retain jurisdiction in Boone, DeKalb, Grundy, Kankakee, Kendall, LaSalle, Ogle, or Winnebago County). Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-ANNEXATION
Sponsors
Rep. William Black [R] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] | Rep. Raymond Poe [R] |
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Rep. Jim Sacia [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0188 | |
2009-08-10 | Effective Date August 10, 2009 | |
2009-08-10 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 | |
2009-04-29 | Postponed - Local Government | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-013-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-03-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2009-03-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-03-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-03-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-24 | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 005-003-000 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe |