IL HB0999 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health to establish women's health clinics throughout the State to provide affordable health care for women. Requires the services provided at the women's health clinics to be offered at an affordable price and to include specified services, including women's health examinations, pregnancy confirmation, prenatal care, labor and delivery services, postpartum care, family planning examinations and birth control services, and care for sexually transmitted diseases and infections.
Title
IDPH-WOMEN'S HEALTH CLINICS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2023-03-10 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-19 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |