IL HB0972 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the amount and nature of medical assistance.
Title
PUBLIC AID-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016 |
2015-12-04 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016 |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2015-09-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2015-09-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-09-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-08-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-08-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2015-08-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-08-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 012-000-005 |
2015-08-06 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2015-08-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2015-08-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-08-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2015-07-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015 |
2015-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015 |
2015-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015 |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-05 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-05 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015 |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |