IL HB0970 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that the Executive Inspector General may make a summary report and response of the ultimate jurisdictional authority or agency head available to the public if the Executive Ethics Commission does not do so. Provides that, prior to publication by the Executive Inspector General, the Executive Inspector General shall permit the respondents, the Commission, and the Attorney General to review the documents to be made public and offer suggestions for redaction or provide a response that shall be made public with the summary report.
Title
ETHICS-SUMMARY REPORTS PUBLIC
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] |
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 20-52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=970&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB0970.htm |