IL HB0962 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Global Partnership Act. Prohibits Illinois Global Partnership, Inc. officers and employees and spouses and immediate family residing with an IGP officer or employee (i) having IGP grants or contracts or specified levels of interests in IGP grants and contracts, (ii) soliciting or accepting gifts from IGP grantees and contractors, and (iii) having IGP travel expenses paid for or reimbursed by IGP grantees or contractors. Requires IGP to develop 2-year goals and strategic plans; requires that IGP annually file the plan and a report of its progress with the Governor and General Assembly, beginning July 1, 2013. Effective immediately.
Title
GLOBAL PARTNERSHIP-ETHICS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0200 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2013 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2013-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate International Trade & Commerce Committee; 016-000-000 |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-02-06 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André M. Thapedi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3948 | 65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3948 | 70 | New Code | See Bill Text |