IL HB0939 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to change the repeal date of the Illinois Architecture Practice Act of 1989 and the Professional Engineering Practice Act of 1989 from January 1, 2010 to January 1, 2020. Amends the Illinois Architecture Practice Act of 1989. Provides that no officer, board, commission, or other public entity charged with the enforcement of codes and ordinances requiring the involvement of an architect shall accept for filing or approval any technical submissions that do not bear the seal and signature of an architect licensed under the Act and that a building permit issued with respect to technical submissions that do not conform to the requirements of this Act shall be invalid. Provides for the establishment of the Architecture Complaint Committee. Makes changes in provisions concerning definitions, technical submissions, powers and duties of the Department and the Board, the Architecture Licensing Board, examinations, qualifications, professional design firm registration, disciplinary action, and investigations. Amends the Professional Engineering Practice Act of 1989. Provides that a building permit issued with respect to technical submissions that do not conform to the requirements of the Act shall be invalid. Sets forth additional examples of the practice of professional engineering and examples of technical submissions. Defines "design/build" and "design/build entity" and makes changes in the definition of "technical submissions". Provides for the establishment of the Professional Engineer Complaint Committee. Allows the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to grant the title "Retired" to eligible retirees to be used immediately adjacent to the title of Professional Engineer. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECTRICIANS LICENSING ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=939&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0939.htm |