IL HB0921 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0046
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that if an educational support personnel employee is removed or dismissed as a result of a decision of the school board to decrease the number of educational support personnel employed by the board or to discontinue some particular type of educational support service and he or she accepts the tender of a vacancy within one calendar year from the beginning of the following school term, then that employee shall maintain any rights accrued during his or her previous service with the school district. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-ED SUPPORT PERSONNEL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0046
2019-07-12HouseEffective Date July 12, 2019
2019-07-12HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Education; 011-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Education
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-20SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-009-000
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-005-000
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-01-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-23.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback