IL HB0917 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1439
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1439
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that medical services provided under the medical assistance program may include dental services provided by an individual licensed to practice dentistry or dental surgery and that "dental services" means diagnostic, preventive, or corrective procedures provided by or under the supervision of a dentist in the practice of his or her profession. Provides that dental services for persons who are participating in education, training, or employment programs operated by the Department of Human Services shall be provided by or under the supervision of a dentist (instead of providing that such dental services shall include but not be limited to prosthodontics).
Title
DHFS-MEDICAID-DENTAL SERVICES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-20 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1439 | |
2010-08-20 | Effective Date August 20, 2010 | |
2010-08-20 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 109-000-001 | |
2010-05-26 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-001 | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 | |
2010-05-04 | Arrived in House | |
2010-05-04 | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 | |
2010-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2010 | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne | |
2010-04-30 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000 | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2010-04-28 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-04-29 | Postponed - Human Services | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services | |
2009-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services | |
2009-04-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William Delgado | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-03 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-002 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |