IL HB0905 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Private Sector Workplace Anti-Harassment Task Force Act. Creates the Private Sector Workplace Anti-Harassment Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall create model policies and best practices to keep workplaces safe from sexual harassment. Provides that the Department of Human Rights shall provide administrative support to the Task Force. Provides that the model policies and best practices shall be finalized by March 1, 2020 and posted on the Department of Human Rights' website within 30 days after finalization. Repeals the Act on March 1, 2021. Effective immediately.
Title
ANTI-HARASSMENT TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |