IL HB0898 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning telecommunications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-24HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2015-04-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2015-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-04-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2015-04-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2015-03-27HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
2015-02-17HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2015-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220513-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback