IL HB0898 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Clerks of Courts Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the office hours of the clerks of courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COURTS-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2011-04-15HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2011-04-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2011-04-14HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2011-04-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2011-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
2011-03-30HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
2011-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2011-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
2011-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2011-03-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2011-02-08HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2011-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2011-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2011-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7051056Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback