IL HB0898 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0147
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. Provides that all faculty and staff members of a university or community college are free to communicate their views on any matter of private or public concern to any member of the legislative, executive, or judicial branch of government, State or federal, without notice to or prior approval of the university or community college, so long as they do not represent that they are speaking for or on behalf of the university or community college. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-FACULTY-OFF CONTACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-07 Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0147
2009-08-07 Effective Date August 7, 2009
2009-08-07 Governor Approved
2009-06-09 Sent to the Governor
2009-05-13 Passed Both Houses
2009-05-13 Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2009-05-12 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009
2009-05-12 Second Reading
2009-04-29 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009
2009-04-29 Do Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000
2009-04-24 Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland
2009-04-22 Assigned to Higher Education
2009-03-26 Referred to Assignments
2009-03-26 First Reading
2009-03-26 Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
2009-03-26 Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
2009-03-26 Arrive in Senate
2009-03-25 Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-001
2009-03-25 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black
2009-03-25 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland
2009-03-17 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-17 Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-02-26 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2009-02-25 Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 007-000-000
2009-02-20 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2009-02-18 Assigned to Higher Education Committee
2009-02-18 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2009-02-18 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose
2009-02-10 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-02-10 First Reading
2009-02-10 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback