IL HB0840 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0044
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0044
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that beginning April 1, 2020, and on a bi-annual basis thereafter, the Illinois Commerce Commission shall issue a report to the General Assembly concerning the decommissioning of nuclear power plants in this State. Provides for the contents of the report.
Title
UTILITY-DECOMMISSION OF PLANTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0044 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-040-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Table Amendment - Prevailed |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-04-11 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 029-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-10 | House | Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 026-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-01 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-012-000 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 8-508.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |