IL HB0839 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits use of a scanning device or reencoder to defraud when the person knowingly possesses, sells, or delivers a scanning device or reencoder, other than for the purpose of processing information to facilitate a lawful financial transaction. Increases the penalties for use of a scanning device or reencoder to defraud from a Class 4 felony for a first offense to a Class 3 felony and for a second or subsequent offense from a Class 3 felony to a Class 2 felony. Provides that the knowing sale or delivery of the device or reencoder is a Class 2 felony for a first offense and a Class 1 felony for a second or subsequent offense.
Title
CRIM CD-SCANNING DEVICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-19 | House | To Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 16-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=839&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0839.htm |