IL HB0834 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the board of trustees of downstate police and downstate firefighter pension funds may, by a resolution adopted by a majority vote of its membership, transfer moneys of the pension fund to the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund for management and administration. Provides guidelines for the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund to follow in investment of the money of downstate police and downstate firefighter pension funds, including the transfer of the funds assets and quarterly and annual reports to the pension funds. Effective January 1, 2010.
Title
PEN CD-POLICE & FIRE-INVESTMNT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-09 | First Reading | |
2009-02-09 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=834&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0834.htm |