IL HB0826 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that it is the power of a school board to hire school social workers. Sets forth qualifications to use the title of "school social worker". Provides that school districts may employ a sufficient number of school social workers to address the needs of their students and schools and may maintain the nationally recommended student-to-school social worker ration of 250 to 1. Prohibits school social workers from providing services outside their employment to any student in the district or districts that employ the school social worker. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SOCIAL WORKERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0356 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 14-1.09a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.53 | New Code | See Bill Text |