IL HB0822 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section granting a natural disaster homestead exemption, removes language providing that the square footage of the rebuilt residential structure may not be more than 110% of the square footage of the original residential structure as it existed immediately prior to the natural disaster. Removes provisions providing that the taxpayer's initial application for a natural disaster homestead exemption must be made no later than the first taxable year after the residential structure is rebuilt. Provides that, if the square footage of the rebuilt structure exceeds 110% of the square footage of the original residential structure as it existed immediately prior to the natural disaster, then the amount of the natural disaster homestead exemption is the equalized assessed value per square foot of the rebuilt structure multiplied by 110% of the square footage of the original residential structure as it existed immediately prior to the natural disaster minus the base amount. Provides that the amendatory Act is retroactive to the 2012 taxable year. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-NATURAL DISASTER
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-173 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=822&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0822.htm |