IL HB0822 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Collegiate Athletic Association Compliance Enforcement Procedures Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-004-000 |
2016-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2016-04-04 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015 |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 25 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |