IL HB0821 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0303
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0303
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Prepaid Wireless 9-1-1 Surcharge Act, the Public Utilities Act, and the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that certain tax returns filed under those Acts must be filed electronically. Provides that vendor discounts under those Acts are allowed only for returns that are filed electronically. Provides that the electronic return requirement does not apply to the Automobile Renting Occupation and Use Tax Act. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-ELECTRONIC FILING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0303 |
2017-08-24 | House | Effective Date August 24, 2017 |
2017-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 006-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-002-000 |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-16 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-02-24 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 13-703 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 155 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 155 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 55.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 55.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 753 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |