IL HB0821 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Condominium Property Act. Provides that if a condominium association's bylaws permit the leasing of an owner's condominium unit and the bylaws are changed to prohibit the leasing of a unit and a unit owner, incorporated under 26 USC 501(c)(3), is leasing the unit at the time that the bylaw goes into effect, then the unit owner may continue to rent the unit until the unit owner voluntarily sells the unit and no fine, fee, dues, or penalty shall be assessed against the unit owner for leasing its unit. Amends the General Not For Profit Corporation Act of 1986. Provides that if a common interest community or homeowners' association that currently permits leasing amends its governing documents to prohibit leasing, that prohibition may not affect a unit owner, incorporated under 26 USC 501(c)(3), then leasing the unit from continuing to rent the unit until the unit owner voluntarily sells the unit and no fine, fee, dues, or penalty shall be assessed against the unit owner for leasing its unit.
Title
CONDOS-BYLAW-RENT PROHIBITIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2009-08-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-22 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary | |
2009-05-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary | |
2009-05-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Cronin | |
2009-05-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-29 | Postponed - Judiciary | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2009-04-01 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-04-01 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan Cronin | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-007-003 | |
2009-03-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Julie Hamos | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-19 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 016-000-000 | |
2009-02-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-09 | First Reading | |
2009-02-09 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |