IL HB0819 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that certificates of registration that are issued or renewed on or after July 1, 2017 shall expire one year (currently, 5 years) after the issuance or last renewal of that certificate of registration. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ROTA-REGISTRATION RENEWAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2017
2017-04-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-03-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-29SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-002-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-16HouseRemains in Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-16HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2017-02-24HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351202aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback