IL HB0816 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0275
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0275
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Provides that, in addition to birth, adoption, or placement for adoption, sick leave shall also be interpreted to mean the acceptance of a child in need of foster care. Provides that for paid sick leave for the acceptance of a child in need of foster care, a school board may require that the teacher or other employee provide evidence that the formal foster care process is underway, and such sick leave is limited to 30 days unless a longer leave has been negotiated with the exclusive bargaining representative. Effective immediately.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 103 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0275 |
2021-08-06 | House | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 103-011-000 |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-007-000 |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-010-000 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-012-000 |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-011-000 |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Re-assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |