IL HB0816 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Innovation and Technology Act. Provides that on or before July 1, 2020, each State agency shall submit to the Department of Innovation and Technology a plan to improve the provision of digital services, including modernizing websites and enhancing the use of data analytics. Provides for the contents of the plan to be submitted to the Department. Provides that on or before July 1, 2021, all State agency websites intended for use by the public shall be mobile-friendly and accessible by persons with disabilities. Requires the Department to adopt rules necessary to implement this Section. Provides findings and purpose provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE WEBSITE MODERNIZATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-06-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-06-01HouseArrived in House
2019-06-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-006-000
2019-06-01Senate3/5 Vote Required
2019-06-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-06-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans
2019-06-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-05-31SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-001-000
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 013-000-000
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-22HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2013701-65New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback