IL HB0816 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the FY2020 Budget Implementation Act. Provides that the purpose of the Act is to make the changes in State programs that are necessary to implement FY2020 budget recommendations. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE WEBSITE MODERNIZATION
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Sen. Heather Steans [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-06-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-06-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-006-000 |
2019-06-01 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-001-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |